Places
Home
Graphs
Prefixes
Admin
Users
Settings
Plugins
Statistics
Repository
Load local file
Load from HTTP
Load from library
Remove triples
Clear repository
RDF quality heuristics
Query
YASGUI SPARQL Editor
Simple Form
SWISH Prolog shell
Help
Documentation
Tutorial
Roadmap
HTTP Services
Login
Local view for "http://purl.org/linkedpolitics/EUmember_1288"
Predicate
Value (sorted:
none
)
lpv
:
politicalFunction
unknown; Fine Gael Party (1989-07-25--1994-07-18)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Delegation for relations with Canada (1992-02-25--1993-02-10)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
unknown; Fine Gael Party (1994-07-19--1999-07-19)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Committee on Foreign Affairs, Human Rights, Common Security and Defence Policy (1999-07-21--2002-01-14)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Delegation for relations with the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics (1989-07-26--1992-01-14)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Delegation for relations with the Member States of ASEAN, South-east Asia and the Republic of Korea (1994-11-17--1995-07-11)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
unknown; Fine Gael Party (1999-07-20--2004-07-19)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
vice-chair; Committee on Foreign Affairs, Security and Defence Policy (1997-01-16--1999-07-19)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
vice-chair; Committee on Regional Policy, Regional Planning and Relations with Regional and Local Authorities (1992-01-15--1994-07-18)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Delegation for relations with the countries of South Asia and the South Asia Association for Regional Cooperation (SAARC) (2002-02-07--2004-07-19)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Committee on Social Affairs, Employment and the Working Environment (1989-07-26--1992-01-14)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Committee on Regional Policy (1996-02-14--1997-01-15)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Temporary committee on improving safety at sea (2003-11-20--2004-04-21)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member;
EPP-ED
(1999-07-20--2004-07-19)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Delegation for relations with Canada (1993-02-11--1994-01-31)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Delegation for relations with Canada (1994-02-01--1994-07-18)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Delegation for relations with the Republics of the Commonwealth of Independent States (CIS) (1992-01-15--1993-02-10)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Committee on Agriculture, Fisheries and Rural Development (1992-01-15--1994-07-18)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Committee on Civil Liberties and Internal Affairs (1994-07-21--1996-02-14)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Committee on Institutional Affairs (1994-07-21--1997-01-15)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member;
EPP
(1994-07-19--1999-07-19)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Delegation for relations with the Member States of ASEAN, South-east Asia and the Republic of Korea (1995-07-12--1997-01-15)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member;
EPP
(1989-07-25--1994-07-18)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Committee on Regional Policy, Transport and Tourism (1999-07-21--2001-07-09)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Committee on Foreign Affairs, Human Rights, Common Security and Defence Policy (2002-01-17--2004-07-19)
2
foaf
:
name
"
John Walls Cushnahan
"
2
rdf
:
type
lpv
:
MemberOfParliament
2,1
lpv
:
place of birth
"
Belfast
"
@
en
2
lpv
:
date of birth
"
1948-07-23
"
^^
xsd
:
date
2
lpv
:
countryOfRepresentation
lp
:
Ireland
2
lpv
:
MEP_ID
"
1288
"
2,1
lpv
:
profile
?
:
1288.html
2
owl
:
sameAs
?
:
John Cushnahan
3
lpv
:
gender
"
male
"
@
en
3
lpv
:
name
"
John Cushnahan
"
@
en
3
rdf
:
type
lpv
:
MemberOfParliament
2,1
rdf
:
type
lpv
:
Speaker
1
lpv
:
MEP_ID
"
1288
"
2,1
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Delegation for relations with the Republics of the Commonwealth of Independent States (CIS) (1993-02-11--1994-01-31)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Committee on Regional Policy and Regional Planning (1989-07-26--1992-01-14)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
substitute; Committee on Institutional Affairs (1997-01-16--1999-07-19)
2
lpv
:
politicalFunction
member; Delegation for relations with the Republics of the Commonwealth of Independent States (CIS) (1994-02-01--1994-07-18)
2
Named graphs describing this resource:
1
http://purl.org/linkedpolitics/rdf/Events_and_structure.ttl.gz
2
http://purl.org/linkedpolitics/rdf/MembersOfParliament_background.ttl.gz
3
http://purl.org/linkedpolitics/rdf/mep_wikidata.ttl.gz
The resource appears as object in
94 triples
Context graph